U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cv-00759
  • Case Name: McGinnis v Roldan, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 28, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.