U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cv-00308
  • Case Name: Edmonds v. McDonald's USA, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.