U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Cavalieri v. Boyers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Transport Inmate]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.