U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Burke v. VitalCore Health Strategies, LLC, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Transport Inmate]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.