U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Farley v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [State Court Records]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Requesting State Court Record]
  • March 24, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.