U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cv-00567
  • Case Name: Brown v. Collier et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response]
  • April 25, 2025: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 24, 2025: [Letter/Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.