U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cv-00507
  • Case Name: Cecil v. Hamrick et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • March 25, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment under Rule 54(b)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment under Rule 54(b)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.