U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cv-00389
  • Case Name: Frith v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 28, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response]
  • April 23, 2025: [Request for Copies]
  • April 02, 2025: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA]
  • April 02, 2025: [USCA Record Request]
  • April 01, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.