U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Thurston v. BankUnited, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Pretrial Order - Moon & Urbanski]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [State Court Records]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 03, 2025: [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 31, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Requesting State Court Record]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.