U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Beer v. Bluefield University
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Settlement Conference/Mediation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Settlement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.