U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cv-00379
  • Case Name: Carlisle v. SMS Group S.p.A.,
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment Based on ADR Settlement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.