Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:3:18-cv-06013
    Party Name:Mael et al v. Evanger's Dog and Cat Food Company, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Filer]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidation Order - for Member cases only]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice-Other]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [2 - Minute Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Motions (Public, notice to parties)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Related Case]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?267943
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =