open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:3:19-cv-05110
    Party Name:Koenen v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Reply]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Responsive]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time-Other]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (non motion)]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Order - set/reset Briefing deadlines]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?269454
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =