open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:3:19-cv-05533
    Party Name:Wilkinson v. Pierce County
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Letter & Form]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Verification of State Court Records]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?274224
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =