open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:3:20-cv-05331
    Party Name:Johnson v. Rembert et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Recusal]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Recusal]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Filer]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [IFP Deficiency Letter]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of USCA]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Time Schedule Order]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Number from USCA]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal to Circuit]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment by Court]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Calendar]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Related Case]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Document(s)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?274249
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =