U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-06031-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Rodriguez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Excludable Start]
  • March 27, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 25, 2025: [Joint Proposed Case Management Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial and Statement of Reasons (TOR and MKD cases)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 18, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 18, 2025: [Consent to Rule 11 Plea Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.