U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ahmed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Review of Detention Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application]
  • March 24, 2025: [Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.