U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frank
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss Count/Counts]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea and Setting Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea and Setting Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Order - Article III Judge]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Excludable Start]
  • March 25, 2025: [z(Court Only) Oral Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing- By Court]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.