U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-01085-
  • Case Name: Roberts v. Rominger et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes - Hearing Not Held Matter Withdrawn cw]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Shorten Time]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [~generic~ Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Amended/Continued Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proof of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [~generic~ Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proof of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Amended/Continued Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [~Supplemental Filing-Use ONLY for Exhibits & Attachments Omitted from Original Docket Event]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Declaration]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Declaration]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [~generic~ Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Miscellaneous Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Withdraw as Attorney (order)]
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Received UNSIGNED Order]
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken (no PDF)]
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Shortening Time (order)]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Received UNSIGNED Order]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Shorten Time]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.