U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-42890-
  • Case Name: Christopher Allen Blake
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellis, Kathryn A [Close Chapter 7 Case (automatic)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellis, Kathryn A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellis, Kathryn A [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellis, Kathryn A [Discharge of Debtor, Chapter 7]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellis, Kathryn A [Receipt of Fee for Final Installment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellis, Kathryn A [Pay Installment Chapter 7 Case (Pay.gov)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellis, Kathryn A [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellis, Kathryn A [Clerks Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Failure to Pay Filing Fees ]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellis, Kathryn A [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellis, Kathryn A [Reaffirmation Agreement (Debtor is represented by attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.