U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40083-
  • Case Name: Kiana Shene Robinson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Krattli, Darren Robert [Close Chapter 7 Case (automatic)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Krattli, Darren Robert [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Krattli, Darren Robert [Discharge of Debtor, Chapter 7 (automatic)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Krattli, Darren Robert [Receipt of Fee for Final Installment]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Krattli, Darren Robert [Receipt of Fee (Generic)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.