U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

washington Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Washington
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00733
  • Case Name: Fractal Analytics Inc. v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [RSM - Joint Status Report Order (FORM)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Praecipe for a Summons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.