U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rayshawn Earl Motley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Voluntary Surrender Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment and Commitment - Redacted]
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 21, 2022: [Letter stating no objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [Letter stating no objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Pretrial Motion Hearing Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Convert Pretrial Motion Hearing to Telephonic]
  • July 01, 2022: [Letter stating no pretrial motions to be filed]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Release Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Trial Deadlines]
  • May 03, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2022: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.