U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hodges
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Status Report ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 21, 2022: [Bond]
  • December 14, 2022: [Status Report ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • November 08, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • November 01, 2022: [Text Only Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Adjourn]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Adjourn]
  • August 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed with arrest]
  • August 17, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Oral Order for Statistical Purposes (no docket text)]
  • August 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • August 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.