U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Johnson, Travis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 29, 2025: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • April 29, 2025: [Telephone Scheduling Conference]
  • April 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2025: [SLC Order on New Criminal Cases]
  • April 28, 2025: [Release Order - Redacted]
  • April 28, 2025: [Release Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief in Opposition]
  • April 24, 2025: [Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.