U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00026
  • Case Name: EagleMed LLC et al v. Wyoming Department of Workforce Services Workers Compensation D
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 19, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • October 12, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 28, 2015: [Strike]
  • September 21, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2015: [Response]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 07, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 07, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 19, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2015
  • February 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.