U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Homeland Insurance Company of New York v. Powell Hospital District No 1 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 08, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Compel]
  • April 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 16, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 11, 2020: [Opposition]
  • February 11, 2020: [Crossclaim]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 28, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • January 14, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 20, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2019: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
  • August 13, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 07, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2019: [Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 16, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 15, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Counterclaim]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 20, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • April 25, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 11, 2019: [Leave to]
  • April 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 09, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • April 05, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 27, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 27, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • March 27, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 20, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 11, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 11, 2019: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 11, 2019: [Compel]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 16, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 13, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 28, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • May 25, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Substitute Party]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 09, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 29, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • March 23, 2018: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 16, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 07, 2018: [Setting Hearing]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 02, 2018: [Substitute Party]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 02, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 01, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • March 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 01, 2018: [Substitute Party]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Transcript]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Staying Case]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 11, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • May 06, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 06, 2016: [Protective Order]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 14, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 07, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 05, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 04, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 02, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Counterclaim]
  • November 13, 2015: [Crossclaim]
  • November 13, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 09, 2015: [Answer to Crossclaim]
October, 2015
  • October 18, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 18, 2015: [Crossclaim]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2015
  • September 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 25, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 23, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 22, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 22, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • July 13, 2015: [Intervene]
  • July 06, 2015: [Reply]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 19, 2015: [Add Party]
  • June 16, 2015: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • June 15, 2015: [Intervene]
February, 2015
  • February 27, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.