U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00151
  • Case Name: United States of America v. One Cessna Airplane, Model Number TU-206 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • November 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 23, 2016: [Status Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 24, 2016: [Vacate]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 17, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order Regarding Appeal of Magistrate Order]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • September 19, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 16, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • September 16, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 07, 2016: [Stay Discovery]
  • September 07, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • September 07, 2016: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 06, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 01, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Response]
  • August 31, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • August 10, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 10, 2016: [Status Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [~Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 08, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 01, 2016: [Setting Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Status Report]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Status Report]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 25, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • January 19, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 12, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • January 05, 2016: [Response]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Appeal of Magistrate Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 09, 2015: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 03, 2015: [Response in Support of Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2015: [Opposition]
  • November 13, 2015: [Compel]
  • November 02, 2015: [Set Aside]
  • November 02, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 20, 2015: [Setting Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • June 23, 2015: [Service by Publication]
  • June 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 20, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2015
  • March 03, 2015: [Stay Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.