U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Gustafson et al v. Black et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 11, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • January 04, 2016: [Intervene]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Setting Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 24, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2015: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 17, 2015: [Continue (Dispositive)]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 06, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2015
  • March 04, 2015: [Lift Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.