U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Brock et al v. Sagebrush Broadcasting Company Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Statement]
  • December 06, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 07, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Return of Sale]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 20, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 12, 2017: [Status Report]
  • May 03, 2017: [Minute Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Staying Case]
  • July 12, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • July 11, 2016: [Vacating Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Brief]
  • May 16, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 13, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 16, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 12, 2016: [Entry of Default]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Service by Publication]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Service by Publication]
  • December 11, 2015: [Service by Publication]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Entry of Default]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 23, 2015: [Service by Publication]
  • October 14, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • October 14, 2015: [Entry of Default]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • August 03, 2015: [Affidavit]
March, 2015
  • March 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.