U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:11-cv-00347
  • Case Name: Northern Arapaho Tribe et al v. United States Fish & Wildlife Service Director e
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Transcript Letter]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • June 24, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 22, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 19, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2015
  • March 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.