U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Nucor Inc et al v. Petrohawk Energy Corporatioin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 12, 2015: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 09, 2015: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [In Limine]
  • September 18, 2015: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 08, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Reply Brief]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order]
  • July 29, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 29, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 15, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 15, 2015: [Brief]
March, 2015
  • March 18, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.