U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Hedquist v. Patterson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 19, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Application for Writ]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Application for Writ]
  • March 07, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Reply]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • September 21, 2017: [Leave to]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2017: [Transcript Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • May 25, 2017: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • May 25, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • May 25, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 17, 2017: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • May 16, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 16, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 16, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • May 03, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 03, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 02, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 27, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 26, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 14, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 05, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Response]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 22, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • September 13, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 13, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • September 13, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 13, 2016: [Reply]
  • September 09, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 25, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • August 22, 2016: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • August 22, 2016: [In Limine]
  • August 22, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • August 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 22, 2016: [Brief]
  • August 22, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 18, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • August 18, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 16, 2016: [Compel]
  • August 16, 2016: [Response]
  • August 15, 2016: [Response]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 12, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Compel]
  • August 03, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • August 01, 2016: [Compel]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 29, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 08, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 28, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 13, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2016: [Reply]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • May 10, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • May 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Reconsideration]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 07, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • April 01, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 17, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 14, 2016: [Response]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • March 14, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 01, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • March 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Protective Order]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 29, 2016: [Compel]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • February 29, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • February 17, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • February 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Protective Order]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [Protective Order]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • November 06, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 19, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 02, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • October 01, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 26, 2015: [Notice of Joinder]
  • September 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 18, 2015: [Status Report]
  • September 17, 2015: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 15, 2015: [Setting Hearing]
  • September 14, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 11, 2015: [Reply]
  • September 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2015: [Reconsideration]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order]
  • August 31, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 31, 2015: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 28, 2015: [Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 11, 2015: [Strike]
  • August 11, 2015: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 11, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 01, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2015
  • March 31, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.