U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00176
  • Case Name: Stewart v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 26, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 14, 2016: [Vacating Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Reply Brief]
  • December 28, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • December 21, 2015: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 21, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 18, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2015: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • December 04, 2015: [In Limine]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 29, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2015
  • April 11, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.