U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00057
  • Case Name: USI Insurance Services LLC v. Thomas R. Potter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 15, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 03, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Supersedeas Bond Discharged]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 16, 2016: [Release Supersedeas Bond]
  • February 16, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 06, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order]
  • September 21, 2015: [Minute Order]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2015
  • April 22, 2015: [Request for Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.