U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Walker et al v. JTM Equipment Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Receipt for Exhibits]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 13, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2018: [Jury Verdict]
  • March 30, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 30, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 30, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • March 30, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 30, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • March 29, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 29, 2018: [Transcript]
  • March 28, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • March 28, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • March 27, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • March 27, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 26, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • March 26, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • March 26, 2018: [Transcript]
  • March 23, 2018: [Deposition]
  • March 23, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • March 23, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • March 22, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • March 22, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • March 21, 2018: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • March 21, 2018: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 20, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2018: [Quash]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 17, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 16, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 13, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 13, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • March 13, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Designation]
  • March 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Strike]
  • March 06, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 06, 2018: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • March 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 02, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 27, 2018: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 26, 2018: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 23, 2018: [Witness List]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 20, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 20, 2018: [Reply]
  • February 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 12, 2018: [Response]
  • February 12, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 05, 2018: [In Limine]
  • February 05, 2018: [Witness List]
  • February 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 11, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 08, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • January 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 02, 2018: [Reply to Response]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Leave to]
  • December 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Leave to]
  • December 20, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 13, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 13, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 11, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 06, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 05, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice of Joinder]
  • December 04, 2017: [Transcript]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 22, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Protective Order]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 12, 2017: [Reply]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 04, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
  • September 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 22, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • September 19, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 18, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 15, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 06, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 04, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 07, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • February 13, 2017: [Stay Discovery]
  • February 06, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 02, 2017: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Statement]
  • December 15, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • October 26, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 10, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 23, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 11, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 15, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 07, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 26, 2015: [Dismissing Party]
  • August 20, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 18, 2015: [Strike]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 12, 2015: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • August 11, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order]
  • July 14, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 01, 2015: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 23, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • June 23, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2015
  • April 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.