U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Perkins et al v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • July 09, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 19, 2015: [Letter(s)]
April, 2015
  • April 24, 2015: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.