U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Parham et al v. Larson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 10, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 01, 2015: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 18, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 13, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
May, 2015
  • May 04, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.