U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Mini Mart Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [- Non Public Document]
  • February 16, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • February 16, 2016: [Brief]
  • February 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 05, 2016: [Compel]
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 01, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 25, 2016: [Compel]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 16, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 05, 2015: [Stipulation]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 10, 2015: [Protective Order]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 07, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2015
  • May 11, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.