U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Crandall v. Weaver
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 22, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • November 16, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 09, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 08, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • October 18, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
  • September 20, 2016: [Transcript]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • August 08, 2016: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • August 04, 2016: [Minute Order]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 10, 2016: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • June 10, 2016: [Bench Trial]
  • June 09, 2016: [Deposition]
  • June 08, 2016: [Bench Trial - Began]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 25, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 23, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 16, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 12, 2016: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 11, 2016: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 29, 2016: [In Limine]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 14, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 14, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 16, 2015: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 14, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 07, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
May, 2015
  • May 20, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.