U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Harper v. Guthrie et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • May 03, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [USCA Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [USCA Notification]
  • March 30, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 06, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • February 06, 2017: [Letter(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • January 23, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • January 06, 2017: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • January 06, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 05, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 02, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Response]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Brief]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • September 27, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 27, 2016: [Opposition]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Mandate]
  • September 21, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 19, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 14, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 25, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 14, 2015: [Response]
  • October 14, 2015: [Reply]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • September 25, 2015: [Opposition]
  • September 25, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • September 16, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order]
  • September 16, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order]
  • September 11, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 11, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 04, 2015: [Financial Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • August 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 24, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 22, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 19, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • June 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 16, 2015: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
May, 2015
  • May 26, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.