U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cv-00035
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Response]
  • February 05, 2019: [Response]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Letter(s)]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • January 06, 2016: [Disbursement of Funds]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • December 03, 2015: [Disbursement of Funds]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • November 04, 2015: [Deposit Funds]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Distribution of Funds]
  • October 20, 2015: [Financial Entry]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • June 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • June 18, 2015: [Deposit Funds]
May, 2015
  • May 29, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.