U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Sullivan v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • November 02, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • November 02, 2015: [Response]
  • November 02, 2015: [Letter(s)]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 19, 2015: [Response]
  • October 15, 2015: [Stay Discovery]
  • October 13, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • October 07, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 01, 2015: [Response]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • September 23, 2015: [Dismissing Party]
  • September 21, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2015: [Reply]
  • September 09, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 04, 2015: [Financial Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • August 25, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • August 24, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 24, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • August 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 12, 2015: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • August 12, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 11, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 09, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 09, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 23, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 19, 2015: [Letter(s)]
  • June 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 16, 2015: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • June 01, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.