U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Geho v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 03, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 03, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 03, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 03, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 31, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 09, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 09, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 06, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.