U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Holmes et al v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 24, 2016: [In Limine]
  • May 20, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 05, 2016: [Designation]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • March 03, 2016: [Continue (Dispositive)]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • February 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 15, 2016: [In Limine]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Designation]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • December 22, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 03, 2015: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 29, 2015: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 03, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 03, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 19, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 19, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 19, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 05, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.