U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Hoff v. Friedman
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 02, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Vacating Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • October 22, 2015: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • September 01, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order]
  • August 31, 2015: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • August 19, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 19, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 03, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order]
  • July 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 12, 2015: [Complaint]
  • June 12, 2015: [Order]
  • June 12, 2015: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.