U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Gerlock v. Parkinson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 04, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 05, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 01, 2015: [Setting Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • June 26, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 26, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 19, 2015: [Removal]
  • June 18, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • June 18, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.