U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Hayes-Steelman v. Casper Re-Entry Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2015: [Response]
  • October 08, 2015: [Reply]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Order]
  • September 14, 2015: [Martinez Report]
  • September 14, 2015: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 12, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 05, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 14, 2015: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • July 13, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 13, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Order]
  • June 19, 2015: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • June 19, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.