U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00122
  • Case Name: McAbee v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [USCA Order]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 02, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 18, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 15, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 11, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • March 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 08, 2016: [Letter(s)]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 17, 2015: [Response]
  • December 14, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 06, 2015: [Dismiss]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.