U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00123
  • Case Name: Steele v. Double Diamond Outfitters, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 11, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 06, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 06, 2017: [Vacate]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2016: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • November 17, 2016: [Strike]
  • November 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [In Limine]
  • September 26, 2016: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 25, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 06, 2016: [In Limine]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 22, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • August 22, 2016: [Designation]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 11, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 03, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • August 01, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 06, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 30, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 30, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 23, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 22, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 17, 2015: [Jury Demand]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.